House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2640 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1667 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1666 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1438 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |