Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB659 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2025

                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 659
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 23, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 659 By:  Flores




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution and punishment of the offense of
 smuggling of persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 20.05(a) and (b), Penal Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if the person knowingly:
 (1)  uses or assists, solicits, encourages, directs,
 aids, or attempts to aid another in the use of a motor vehicle,
 aircraft, watercraft, or other means of conveyance to transport an
 individual with the intent to:
 (A)  conceal the individual from a peace officer
 or special investigator; or
 (B)  flee or aid the person using the motor
 vehicle, aircraft, watercraft, or other means of conveyance in
 fleeing from a person the actor knows is a peace officer or special
 investigator attempting to lawfully arrest or detain the actor or
 person the actor assisted, solicited, encouraged, directed, aided,
 or attempted to aid in using the motor vehicle, aircraft,
 watercraft, or other means of conveyance;
 (2)  encourages or induces a person to enter or remain
 in this country in violation of federal law by concealing,
 harboring, or shielding that person from detection; [or]
 (3)  assists, guides, or directs an individual [two or
 more individuals] to enter or remain on public or private property
 [agricultural land] without the effective consent of the owner; or
 (4)  takes an individual to or forces an individual to
 remain on public or private property without the individual's
 effective consent.
 (b)  Subject to Subsections (b-1) and (b-2), an offense under
 this section is a felony of the third degree with a term of
 imprisonment of 10 years, except that the offense is:
 (1)  a felony of the second degree with a minimum term
 of imprisonment of 10 years if:
 (A)  the actor commits the offense in a manner
 that creates a substantial likelihood that the smuggled individual
 will suffer serious bodily injury or death;
 (B)  the smuggled individual is a child younger
 than 18 years of age at the time of the offense;
 (C)  the offense was committed with the intent to
 obtain a pecuniary benefit;
 (D)  during the commission of the offense the
 actor, another party to the offense, or an individual assisted,
 guided, or directed by the actor knowingly possessed a firearm; or
 (E)  the actor commits the offense under
 Subsection (a)(1)(B); or
 (2)  a felony of the first degree with a minimum term of
 imprisonment of 10 years if:
 (A)  it is shown on the trial of the offense that,
 as a direct result of the commission of the offense, the smuggled
 individual became a victim of sexual assault, as defined by Section
 22.011, or aggravated sexual assault, as defined by Section 22.021;
 [or]
 (B)  the smuggled individual suffered serious
 bodily injury or death; or
 (C)  the actor used government resources to
 facilitate the commission of the offense.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *