House | 05/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 726 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |