House | 05/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 874 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 874 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 873 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 West | Journal Page: 870 |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA3 West | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Miles | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 870 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 504 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |