Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB693 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: West S.B. No. 693
2-
3-
2+ (In the Senate - Filed January 3, 2025; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
4+ March 31, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 31, 2025,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 693 By: Flores
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to notaries public; creating a criminal offense.
914 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1015 SECTION 1. Section 406.006, Government Code, is amended to
1116 read as follows:
1217 Sec. 406.006. QUALIFICATION. An individual qualifies by:
1318 (1) properly completing the application form;
1419 (2) executing the statement;
1520 (3) providing the bond, if required;
1621 (4) paying the required filing fees; [and]
1722 (5) meeting the eligibility requirements; and
1823 (6) successfully completing the education
1924 requirements established under Section 406.023.
2025 SECTION 2. Section 406.009(d), Government Code, is amended
2126 to read as follows:
2227 (d) In this section, "good cause" includes:
2328 (1) a false statement knowingly made in an
2429 application;
2530 (2) the failure to comply with Section 406.017;
2631 (3) a final conviction for a violation of a law
2732 concerning the regulation of the conduct of notaries public in this
2833 or another state;
2934 (4) the imposition on the notary public of an
3035 administrative, criminal, or civil penalty for a violation of a law
3136 or rule prescribing the duties of a notary public; [or]
3237 (5) performing any notarization when the person for
3338 whom the notarization is performed did not personally appear before
3439 the notary at the time the notarization is executed; or
3540 (6) failure to maintain records under Section 406.014.
3641 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 406, Government Code, is
3742 amended by adding Section 406.0091 to read as follows:
3843 Sec. 406.0091. OFFENSE OF NOTARIZATION FOR PERSON NOT
3944 PERSONALLY APPEARING. (a) A person commits an offense if, as a
4045 notary public, the person performs any notarization with knowledge
4146 that the signer, grantor, maker, or principal for whom the
4247 notarization is performed did not personally appear before the
4348 notary public at the time the notarization is executed.
4449 (b) An offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor,
4550 except that it is a state jail felony if the document being
4651 notarized involves the transfer of real property.
4752 (c) It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under
4853 Subsection (a) that the person who personally appeared before the
4954 notary public knowingly presented an apparently valid proof of
5055 identification identifying the person as the signer, grantor,
5156 maker, or principal for whom the notarization was purported to be
5257 performed, regardless of the identity of the person.
5358 (d) For purposes of this section, a person personally
5459 appears before a notary public if:
5560 (1) for a notarization other than an online
5661 notarization, the person physically appears before the notary
5762 public at the time of the notarization in a manner that permits the
5863 notary public and the person to see, hear, communicate with, and
5964 provide proof of identification to each other; and
6065 (2) for an online notarization, the person appears at
6166 the time of the notarization by an interactive two-way video and
6267 audio conference technology that meets the standards adopted for
6368 online notarization under Section 406.104.
6469 SECTION 4. Section 406.011, Government Code, is amended by
6570 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
6671 (c) A notary public who has applied for reappointment must
6772 successfully complete the continuing education requirements
6873 established under Section 406.023 before being reappointed.
6974 SECTION 5. Section 406.014, Government Code, is amended by
7075 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
7176 (g) A notary public shall retain the records required by
7277 Subsection (a) until the 10th anniversary of the date of
7378 notarization.
7479 SECTION 6. Section 406.023, Government Code, is amended by
7580 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
7681 (d) The secretary of state shall adopt rules necessary to
7782 establish education requirements for appointment and continuing
7883 education requirements for reappointment as a notary public. The
7984 rules:
8085 (1) may not require a person to complete more than two
8186 hours of education for appointment or two hours of continuing
8287 education for reappointment;
8388 (2) must require that the secretary of state establish
84- and offer education and continuing education courses and allow the
85- secretary of state to charge a reasonable price for each course;
89+ and offer education and continuing education courses for a
90+ reasonable price;
8691 (3) must prohibit any person other than the secretary
8792 of state from providing education or continuing education courses;
8893 and
8994 (4) may not require a person appointed as a notary
9095 public before September 1, 2025, to complete education requirements
9196 required for initial appointment as a notary public on or after that
9297 date.
9398 SECTION 7. Not later than January 1, 2026, the secretary of
9499 state shall adopt rules necessary to implement the change in law
95100 made by this Act.
96101 SECTION 8. The change in law made by this Act applies only
97102 to an application for a notary public appointment or reappointment
98103 submitted on or after January 1, 2026. An application submitted
99104 before January 1, 2026, is governed by the law as it existed
100105 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
101106 continued in effect for that purpose.
102107 SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
108+ * * * * *