House
|
05/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 970
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Perry
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 867
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Perry
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 881
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 545
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 545
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|