2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed January 6, 2025; February 7, 2025, |
---|
| 3 | + | read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; |
---|
| 4 | + | February 12, 2025, re-referred to Committee on Local Government; |
---|
| 5 | + | March 24, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; March 24, 2025, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 8 | | |
---|
5 | 9 | | |
---|
6 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
7 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
8 | 12 | | relating to the establishment and use of a written electronic |
---|
9 | 13 | | communications system accessible to the public by certain municipal |
---|
10 | 14 | | entities. |
---|
11 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 551.006(b), Government Code, is amended |
---|
13 | 17 | | to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 18 | | (b) Except as provided by Section 551.0061, a [A] |
---|
15 | 19 | | governmental body may have no more than one online message board or |
---|
16 | 20 | | similar Internet application to be used for the purposes described |
---|
17 | 21 | | in Subsection (a). The online message board or similar Internet |
---|
18 | 22 | | application must be owned or controlled by the governmental body, |
---|
19 | 23 | | prominently displayed on the governmental body's primary Internet |
---|
20 | 24 | | web page, and no more than one click away from the governmental |
---|
21 | 25 | | body's primary Internet web page. |
---|
22 | 26 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 551, Government Code, is |
---|
23 | 27 | | amended by adding Section 551.0061 to read as follows: |
---|
24 | 28 | | Sec. 551.0061. WRITTEN ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS |
---|
25 | 29 | | ACCESSIBLE TO PUBLIC FOR CERTAIN MUNICIPAL ENTITIES. (a) The |
---|
26 | 30 | | governing body of a municipality by ordinance or resolution may |
---|
27 | 31 | | authorize a commission or other entity organized under Subchapter |
---|
28 | 32 | | A, Chapter 211, Local Government Code, to establish and use an |
---|
29 | 33 | | online message board or similar Internet application for the |
---|
30 | 34 | | purposes described in Section 551.006(a). |
---|
31 | 35 | | (b) A governing body adopting an ordinance or resolution |
---|
32 | 36 | | under this section may authorize use of the online message board or |
---|
33 | 37 | | similar Internet application for a period of not longer than two |
---|
34 | 38 | | years, and may reauthorize use of the message board or application |
---|
35 | 39 | | in the same manner and for the same period as many times as the |
---|
36 | 40 | | governing body determines is appropriate. The governing body may |
---|
37 | 41 | | rescind an ordinance or resolution adopted under this section at |
---|
38 | 42 | | any time. |
---|
39 | 43 | | (c) An online message board or similar Internet application |
---|
40 | 44 | | authorized by this section is separate from and in addition to a |
---|
41 | 45 | | municipal online message board or similar Internet application |
---|
42 | 46 | | authorized by Section 551.006. |
---|
43 | 47 | | (d) The use and administration of an online message board or |
---|
44 | 48 | | similar Internet application authorized by this section must comply |
---|
45 | 49 | | with the requirements of Section 551.006. |
---|
46 | 50 | | (e) A municipal governing body that authorizes use of an |
---|
47 | 51 | | online message board or similar Internet application under this |
---|
48 | 52 | | section shall require a municipal employee to monitor the message |
---|
49 | 53 | | board or application for compliance with this section and Section |
---|
50 | 54 | | 551.006. |
---|
51 | 55 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|