Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 01/06/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/06/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |