House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2640 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Cook | Journal Page: 1656 |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Cook | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1655 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1655 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1552 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 590 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/07/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/07/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |