House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 767 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 A. Hinojosa | Journal Page: 664 |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA3 A. Hinojosa | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 664 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Kolkhorst | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 687 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 459 | |
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/08/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |