Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB748 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/05/2025

                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 748
 (In the Senate - Filed January 9, 2025; February 7, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 May 5, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; May 5, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of laser hair removal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 401.5011, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 401.5011.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. The executive
 director shall administer and enforce this subchapter [chapter].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 401.516(b) and (c), Health and Safety
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *