Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#940
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#803
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended
|
2-Darby
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended 2-Darby
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2122
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended 1-Darby
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1360
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 211
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 211
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|