House
|
05/02/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 824
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 743
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 542
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 447
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|