Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB816 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025
Analysis January 16, 2025
Fiscal Note January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Analysis April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2025
Fiscal Note April 18, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2025
Analysis April 16, 2025