House | 05/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 243 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 243 | |
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |