House | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 938 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 894 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 894 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 542 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |