Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 248 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 248 | |
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 227 | |
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |