House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |