House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 333 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to s/c on State-Federal Relations by Speaker | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1086 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 853 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 853 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 853 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 853 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 846 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 251 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 251 | |
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |