House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1554 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1341 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1305 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 253 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 253 | |
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |