House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 296 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 253 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 253 | |
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |