House
|
05/07/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1703
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Record vote RV#1703
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 4984
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 508
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 253
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 253
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|