House | 05/08/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1878 | |
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1860 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 254 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 254 | |
Senate | 01/27/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |