House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1369 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 1076 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1076 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1076 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1075 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 80 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 80 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |