House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Amendment fails of adoption | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Menndez | Journal Page: 823 |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 846 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 687 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |