House | 05/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | Journal Page: 513 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 400 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |