House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to s/c on Property Tax Appraisals by Speaker | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 761 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 739 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |