House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1374 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |