House | 05/08/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1832 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hall | Journal Page: 1831 |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1831 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |