House | 05/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 738 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 259 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 259 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |