Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2025
Analysis February 7, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill April 29, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 19, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 10, 2025
Bill March 10, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2025
Bill March 10, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 5, 2025