House | 05/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1089 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 591 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 542 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 445 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 445 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |