Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |