House | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 765 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 505 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 482 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Rules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day | Journal Page: 470 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |