House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2268
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1372
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1044
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1044
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1044
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1044
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1044
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1044
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1043
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|