Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR66 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Perry, et al. S.J.R. No. 66




 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating a portion of the
 revenue derived from state sales and use taxes and insurance
 premium taxes to the Texas water fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49-d-16, Article III, Texas
 Constitution, as proposed by S.J.R. 75, 88th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2023, is amended by amending Subsections (c) and (e) and
 adding Subsections (e-1), (e-2), and (e-3) to read as follows:
 (c)  The Texas water fund consists of:
 (1)  money transferred or deposited to the credit of
 the fund under this constitution or by general law, including money
 appropriated by the legislature directly to the fund and money from
 any source transferred or deposited to the credit of the fund
 authorized by this constitution or by general law;
 (2)  any other revenue that the legislature by statute
 dedicates for deposit to the credit of the fund;
 (3)  investment earnings and interest earned on amounts
 credited to the fund;
 (4)  money from gifts, grants, or donations to the
 fund; and
 (5)  money returned from any authorized transfer.
 (e)  For the period of 10 state fiscal years beginning
 September 1, 2043, and for each period of 10 state fiscal years that
 occur after that period has ended, the legislature by general law
 may allocate for transfer to the funds and accounts administered by
 the Texas Water Development Board or that board's successor the
 money deposited to the credit of the Texas water fund under Section
 7-e, Article VIII, of this constitution.  The allocation of money
 prescribed by a general law enacted under this subsection may not be
 amended by the legislature during the 10-year period for which the
 money is allocated.  Any money deposited to the credit of the Texas
 water fund under Section 7-e, Article VIII, of this constitution
 that is not allocated by a general law enacted under this subsection
 may be transferred to other funds or accounts by the Texas Water
 Development Board or that board's successor in accordance with
 Subsection  (b)  of this section.
 (e-1)  Of the amount of money initially appropriated to the
 Texas water fund, the administrator of the fund shall allocate not
 less than 25 percent to be used only for transfer to the New Water
 Supply for Texas Fund.
 (e-2)  Of the amount of money deposited to the credit of the
 Texas water fund under Section 7-e, Article VIII, of this
 constitution before September 1, 2043, the administrator of the
 fund shall allocate not less than 80 percent to be used only for
 transfer to the New Water Supply for Texas Fund.
 (e-3)  This subsection and Subsections (e-1) and (e-2) of
 this section expire August 31, 2043.
 SECTION 2.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-e to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-e.  (a)  Subject to Section 7-d of this article and
 Subsections  (b)  and (c)  of this section, in each state fiscal
 year, the comptroller of public accounts shall deposit to the
 credit of the Texas water fund:
 (1)  the net revenue derived from the imposition of the
 state sales and use tax on the sale, storage, use, or other
 consumption in this state of taxable items under Chapter 151, Tax
 Code, or its successor, that exceeds the first $46.5 billion of that
 revenue coming into the treasury in that state fiscal year,
 provided that the total amount deposited to the credit of the Texas
 water fund under this subsection in a state fiscal year may not
 exceed $500 million; and
 (2)  the first $500 million of the net revenue derived
 from the imposition of the insurance premium taxes on the taxable
 gross premiums, gross premium receipts, and gross revenues from the
 sale of certificates or contracts subject to those taxes under
 Subtitle B, Title 3, Insurance Code, or its successor, coming into
 the treasury in that state fiscal year.
 (b)  The legislature by adoption of a resolution approved by
 a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house of the
 legislature may direct the comptroller of public accounts to reduce
 the amount of money deposited to the credit of the Texas water fund
 under Subsection  (a)  of this section.  The comptroller may be
 directed to make that reduction only:
 (1)  in the state fiscal year in which the resolution is
 adopted, or in either of the following two state fiscal years; and
 (2)  by an amount or percentage that does not result in
 a reduction of more than 50 percent of the amount that would
 otherwise be deposited to the fund in the affected state fiscal year
 under the applicable subsection of this section.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection  (d)  of this section, the duty of
 the comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under
 Subsection (a) of this section expires August 31, 2043.
 (d)  The legislature by adoption of a concurrent resolution
 approved by a record vote of a majority of the members of each house
 of the legislature may extend, in 10-year increments, the duty of
 the comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under
 Subsection (a) of this section beyond the date prescribed by
 Subsection (c) of this section.
 SECTION 3.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, dedicating a portion of the revenue derived
 from state sales and use taxes and the insurance premium taxes to
 the Texas water fund.
 (b)  Section 7-e,  Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2027.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2028.
 SECTION 4.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 4, 2025.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating a portion of
 the revenue derived from state sales and use taxes and insurance
 premium taxes to the Texas water fund."