Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR8 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R346 JRJ-D
 By: Zaffirini S.J.R. No. 8




 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment establishing the Texas
 Redistricting Commission to redistrict the United States House of
 Representatives and the Texas Legislature.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 28a to read as follows:
 Sec. 28a.  (a) The Texas Redistricting Commission exercises
 the legislative authority of this state to adopt redistricting
 plans for the election of members of the United States House of
 Representatives elected from this state, the Texas House of
 Representatives, and the Texas Senate. Districts for those
 legislative bodies may not be established or changed except as
 provided by this section.
 (b)  The legislature shall provide by general law for the
 composition and operation of the Texas Redistricting Commission.
 (c)  This section takes effect January 1, 2030. On that
 date, the Legislative Redistricting Board is abolished and Section
 28 of this article is repealed. The Texas Redistricting Commission
 shall convene for the first time on the first business day after
 January 31, 2031. This subsection expires January 1, 2032.
 SECTION 2.  Section 7a, Article V, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by amending Subsections (e) and (i) and adding Subsection
 (j) to read as follows:
 (e)  Unless the legislature enacts a statewide
 reapportionment of the judicial districts following each federal
 decennial census, the board shall convene not later than the first
 Monday of June of the third year following the year in which the
 federal decennial census is taken to make a statewide
 reapportionment of the districts. The board shall complete its
 work on the reapportionment and file its order with the secretary of
 state not later than August 31 of the same year. If the Judicial
 Districts Board fails to make a statewide apportionment by that
 date, the Texas [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board]
 established by Article III, Section 28a [28], of this constitution
 shall convene on September 1 of the same year to make a statewide
 reapportionment of the judicial districts not later than the 90th
 [150th] day after the final day for the Judicial Districts Board to
 make the reapportionment.
 (i)  The legislature, the Judicial Districts Board, or the
 Texas [Legislative] Redistricting Commission [Board] may not
 redistrict the judicial districts to provide for any judicial
 district smaller in size than an entire county except as provided by
 this section. Judicial districts smaller in size than the entire
 county may be created subsequent to a general election where a
 majority of the persons voting on the proposition adopt the
 proposition "to allow the division of ____________ County into
 judicial districts composed of parts of ____________ County." No
 redistricting plan may be proposed or adopted by the legislature,
 the Judicial Districts Board, or the Texas [Legislative]
 Redistricting Commission [Board] in anticipation of a future action
 by the voters of any county.
 (j)  Until January 1, 2030, a reference in this section to
 the Texas Redistricting Commission means the Legislative
 Redistricting Board established under Article III, Section 28, of
 this constitution. This subsection expires January 1, 2031.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 4, 2025.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 following proposition:  "The constitutional amendment establishing
 the Texas Redistricting Commission to redistrict the United States
 House of Representatives and the Texas Legislature."