Senate | 04/23/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1437 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1405 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 726 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 723 | |
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |