Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR143 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/26/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 143
 In Memory
 of
 Roy Benavidez
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the
 citizens of Texas in remembering the life and legacy of Medal of
 Honor recipient Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez and the loaning
 of his Medal of Honor to the new National Medal of Honor Museum in
 Arlington; and
 WHEREAS, A native Texan, Master Sergeant Benavidez was
 born on August 5, 1935, in Lindenau, the son of a sharecropper;
 orphaned at an early age and raised by relatives, he dropped out
 of school at the age of 14 to work in the fields before enlisting
 in the U.S. Army in June 1955; and
 WHEREAS, While on his first tour of duty in Vietnam, this
 admirable soldier was injured by a land mine, and though doctors
 feared he might never walk again, Master Sergeant Benavidez
 recovered fully and returned to Vietnam with the Green Berets, an
 elite Special Forces unit; and
 WHEREAS, On the morning of May 2, 1968, while assigned to the
 Loc Ninh base in South Vietnam, then-Sergeant Benavidez learned that
 12 members of a Special Forces reconnaissance team were surrounded by
 enemy troops inside Cambodia and under heavy fire; this heroic Texan
 courageously volunteered for the evacuation mission to aid in the
 rescue of his fellow soldiers; and
 WHEREAS, Though intense small-arms and antiaircraft fire
 made the rescue operation tremendously dangerous, Sergeant
 Benavidez jumped from the helicopter into enemy gunsights; even
 before he reached the stranded team's position, he had been
 wounded in his right leg, face, and head, yet despite his painful
 injuries, Sergeant Benavidez carried the wounded men to the
 waiting helicopter and provided protective fire to cover the
 remaining crew; and
 WHEREAS, The mission grew more complicated as Sergeant
 Benavidez retrieved classified documents from dead and wounded
 team members, and he worked quickly to secure them despite
 sustaining more severe wounds from gunshots to his abdomen and
 grenade fragments in his back; while attempting takeoff, the
 pilot was mortally wounded, and the helicopter crashed; despite
 the chaos around him, Sergeant Benavidez freed those aboard from
 the wreckage and established a defensive perimeter under
 increasing enemy gunfire and grenade attacks; and
 WHEREAS, Acting as a medic, directing by radio the fire
 from gunships overhead, and even engaging in hand-to-hand combat
 with the enemy, Sergeant Benavidez bravely weathered a harrowing
 six hours in hell and saved the lives of eight men through his
 leadership and action; he had been clubbed, shot, and bayoneted,
 yet Sergeant Benavidez prevailed, and when his actions were
 praised as awesome and extraordinary, he defined them only as
 duty; and
 WHEREAS, For his exceptional valor, Sergeant Benavidez was
 awarded the Distinguished Service Cross; then on February 24,
 1981, 44 years ago, Master Sergeant (Ret.) Roy P. Benavidez was
 presented with the Congressional Medal of Honor by President
 Ronald Reagan; and
 WHEREAS, Even after his retirement from the military, he
 continued to serve his country by devoting his time and energy to
 veterans groups and by visiting schools to speak to youths on
 critical issues such as courage, commitment, education, faith,
 patriotism, and staying away from drug use and gangs; and
 WHEREAS, Though this brave soldier died on November 29,
 1998, his widow Hilaria "Lala" Coy Benavidez and their three
 children, son Noel and daughters Yvette and Denise, have carried
 on Master Sergeant Benavidez's legacy by remaining active in
 their community with various civic organizations and
 volunteering their time with the Boy Scouts of America, which
 paved the way for six of Master Sergeant Benavidez's grandsons to
 earn the rank of Eagle Scout; and
 WHEREAS, On February 6, 2011, the late Hilaria "Lala"
 Coy Benavidez generously loaned her husband's Medal of Honor
 to the Ronald Regan Presidential Library in Simi Valley,
 California, where it was on display for tens of thousands of
 museum visitors to see and learn about the life and legacy of
 Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez; and
 WHEREAS, On January 3, 2025, the children of Master
 Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez traveled to the Ronald Reagan
 Presidential Library to take part in a handoff ceremony, which
 consisted of the Ronald Reagan Presidential Library handing over
 Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez's Medal of Honor to his three
 children so that it can return home to Texas; and
 WHEREAS, The children of Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez
 have generously loaned their father's Medal of Honor to the new
 National Medal of Honor Museum in Arlington, where it will be one
 of several Medals of Honor from living and deceased recipients
 that have been either donated or loaned to the new museum and will
 be on display for the public to see; and
 WHEREAS, A deserving recipient of the highest and most
 prestigious military decoration of valor, Roy Benavidez
 demonstrated extraordinary courage in the line of duty, and he
 will forever be remembered with great admiration; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 89th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life and legacy of Master
 Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez and extend to his family sincere
 appreciation for their generosity in sharing his inspiring story
 with others; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family as an expression of deepest gratitude
 from the Texas Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day,
 it do so in memory of Master Sergeant Roy P. Benavidez and his
 wife Lala.
 Huffman
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 26, 2025,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate