Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR338 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/01/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on Property Tax Appraisals by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/03/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
SB8
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 11:12AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 S Reported enrolled
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar