Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Telecommunications & Broadband by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Environmental Regulation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM