LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Committees
Local & Consent Calendars
Bills & Legislation
TX
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
House Local & Consent Calendars Committee
Bills & Legislation
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR654
Commemorating the 214Selena festival in Oak Cliff.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR123
Commemorating the 250th anniversary of the adoption of the American Declaration of Independence.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR655
In memory of Clifford Hastings Johnson.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR657
In memory of the 21 victims of the mass shooting that took place at Robb Elementary School in Uvalde on May 24, 2022.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HCR124
Designating May 6, 2025, as Alzheimer's Advocacy Day.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR659
Recognizing April 2, 2025, as Strength in Unity: Elevating Texas Together Day at the State Capitol and extending appreciation to the members of the Bochasanwasi Akshar Purushottam Swaminarayan Sanstha spiritual organization.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR658
Honoring John Sharp for his service as chancellor of The Texas A&M University System.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR660
In memory of Lana Kay Andrews of Dallas.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR758
Recognizing April 22, 2025, as McMullen County Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR760
Recognizing April 9, 2025, as City of Kenedy Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR763
In memory of Sharon Carol "Shay" Shugert of El Paso.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR762
In memory of Eugene Frank Zaboroski of Cypress.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR764
Recognizing April 24, 2025, as Reman Day.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR765
Recognizing April 14, 2025, as San Antonio Mission Indian Descendants Day at the State Capitol.
TX
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HR766
Congratulating Felix Lopez of Southwest Legacy High School on being named KSAT's Educator of the Month.
Page 42 of 58
42
43
44
45
46
47
48
49
50
51