House | 03/23/2023 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 16. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee on Transportation discharged. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-24, Part I. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 20. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 10 . | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Introduced in House |