Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 188 (Roll no. 93). (text: CR H1255)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 213 (Roll no. 92).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Mr. Levin moved to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H1270)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1270-1272)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the House resumed consideration of H.R. 1121.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 1121 are postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1121.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, H. Res. 987 and H.R. 7023. The resolution provides for consideration H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, and H. Res. 987 under a closed rule, and H.R. 7023 under a structured rule, each with one hour of general debate. The rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, and H.R. 7023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1085. (consideration: CR H1255-1264)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1085 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, H. Res. 98and H.R. 7023. The resolution provides for consideration H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, H. Con. Res. 86, and H. Res. 987 under a closed rule, and H.R. 7023 under a structured rule, each with one hour of general debate. The rule provides for one motion to recommit each on H.R. 1023, H.R. 1121, H.R. 6009, and H.R. 7023.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 305.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-19, Part II.
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 17.
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-19, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 19.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 11 .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|