House
|
09/21/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 712 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, H.R. 1130 and H. Res. 684. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4365, under a structured rule; H.R. 1130, under a structured rule; and H.Res. 684, under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on all three bills.
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 699 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1130, H. Res. 684 and H.R. 5525. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1130, under a structured rule; H.Res. 684, under a closed rule; and H.R. 5525, under a closed rule. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on all three bills.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 11.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 9 .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|