Senate
|
12/18/2023
|
Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 293.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 330 - 99 (Roll no. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6921)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1147, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
The House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1147.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 922, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Tiffany amendment No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 922, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Mills amendment No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 922, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Luna amendment No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1147.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
The Speaker designated the Honorable Scott DesJarlais to act as Chairman of the Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 922 and Rule XVIII.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 and H.R. 357. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and H.R. 357 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on both measures. It also provides that on any legislative day of the second session of the 118th Congress before January 9, 2024, the Speaker may dispense with organizational and legislative business and that the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved if applicable.
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 922. (consideration: CR H6889-6907; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H6903)
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 922 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 and H.R. 357. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1147 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and H.R. 357 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on both measures. It also provides that on any legislative day of the second session of the 118th Congress before January 9, 2024, the Speaker may dispense with organizational and legislative business and that the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved if applicable.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 103.
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 118-131.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 13.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|