House
|
05/11/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
On passage Passed by recorded vote: 230 - 200 (Roll no. 211). (text: CR H2281-2283)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 210 - 221 (Roll no. 210).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2294-2295)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on the motion to recommit the bill and by voice vote announced the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Sykes demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postoned further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Mrs. Sykes moved to recommit to the Committee on Ways and Means. (text: CR H2292)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1163.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2 and H.R. 1163. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2 under a closed rule with five hours of general debate, and the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1163 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on each measure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 383. (consideration: CR H2281-2292)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 383 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 383 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2 and H.R. 1163. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2 under a closed rule with five hours of general debate, and the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1163 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on each measure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 21.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-34.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 17.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|