Senate
|
09/18/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 190 (Roll no. 391). (text: CR H4318)
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 193 - 212 (Roll no. 390).
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Mr. Levin moved to recommit to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (text: CR H4326)
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1435.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1435 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed. Bill is closed to amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 681. (consideration: CR H4318-4328)
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 681 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 681 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1435 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed. Bill is closed to amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 680 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1435 and H.R. 4365. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1435 under a closed rule and H.R. 4365 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit allowed.
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-169.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 22.
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 8.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|