Senate
|
09/18/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 9/12/2023 CR H4251)
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4328)
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Westerman objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1450.
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4251-4253)
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155.
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-168, Part II.
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 118-168, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 39 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 51 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Subcommittee on Forestry Discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|