Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 4 (Roll no. 386). (text: 9/12/2023 CR H4249)
|
|
|
House
|
09/13/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4276-4277)
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1567.
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4249-4251)
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 149.
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Committee on Agriculture discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-186, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee Hearings Held.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|